CA AB2884 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 294, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 294, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8880.4 of the Government Code, relating to the California State Lottery, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California State Lottery: revenue allocation.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2884 Berman Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2884 Berman By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2884 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2884 Berman By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2884 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 294, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 5356.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4402.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4755.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 13). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8880.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |