CA AB2902 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42652.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Organic waste: reduction regulations: exemptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2902 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2902 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42652.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |