CA AB2920 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1628, 1634.1, and 1636.4 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Dentistry: dental schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1628 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1634.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1636.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |