CA AB2932 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 33546.2 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: sextortion prevention.
Sponsors
Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Assembly - AB 2932 Joe Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2932 Joe Patterson et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2932 Joe Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2932 Joe Patterson et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2932 Joe Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33546.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |