CA AB3007 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 711.4 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: record of environmental documents: format.
Sponsors
Asm. Josh Hoover [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 3007 Hoover Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 3007 Hoover Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 711.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |