CA AB3041 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 19991.20) of Part 2.6 of Division 5 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 3073, 3075, 3075.1, 3076.3, 3077, 3077.5, 3078, 3078.5, 3079, 3080, 3081, 3082, 3085, and 3091 of, and to add Sections 3075.2, 3075.3, 3076.1, and 3077.1 to, the Labor Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Civil service: Career Development Apprenticeship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and L. & E. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19991.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3075 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3075.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3075.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3075.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3076.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3076.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3077 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3077.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3077.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3078 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3078.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3079 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3082 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3085 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |