CA AB3055 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14902 of, and to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 13030) to Chapter 1 of Division 6 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Survivors of human trafficking: identification cards.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 13030 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 14902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |