CA AB3057 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 24473 of, and to add Section 23701m to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Corporation taxes: exempt organizations: mutual ditch or irrigation companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23701 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24473 | Amended Code | Citation Text |