CA AB3103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14978.1 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to commercial feed.
Title
Commercial feed: Feed Inspection Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 14978.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3103 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3103 |