CA AB311 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.6.7 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: Water Quality, Supply, and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |