CA AB3114 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21189.81 and 21189.82 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: expedited judicial review: sustainable aviation fuel projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21189.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |