CA AB3116 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71204 of the Public Resources Code, relating to invasive species.
Title
Ballast water.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3116 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3116 |