CA AB3167 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 94801.5, 94874.9, and 94930.5 of, and to add Section 94842.5 to, the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education.
Title
California Private Postsecondary Education Act of 2009: highly qualified private nonprofit institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 3167 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 3167 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and ED. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 94801.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94842.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94874.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94930.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |