CA AB3176 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8773.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to land surveying.
Title
Professional land surveyors: surveying practices: monuments and corner accessories.
Sponsors
Asm. Josh Hoover [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 3176 Hoover Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5152.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8773.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |