CA AB3179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7296.2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State agencies: bilingual services.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] |
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3179 Salas et al. By Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3179 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3179 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-22 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5825.). |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5509.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7292.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 7296.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |