CA AB3186 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1776.1 to the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: prevailing wages: access to records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 3186 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1776.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |