CA AB320 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 69510, 69511, and 69511.5 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student Aid Commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 320 Lee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1362.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69511.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |