CA AB3203 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23504.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Craft distillers: direct shipping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB3203 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 3203 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 3203 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23504.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |