CA AB3210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17391 of the Education Code, and to add Section 65913.17 to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Affordable Housing on K–12 Lands Act of 2024.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17391 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65913.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |