CA AB3218 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 849, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 849, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22980 and 22990 of, and to add Sections 22974.2 and 22978.3 to, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 104559.5 of, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 104559.1) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 103 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 30101.7 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to tobacco, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unflavored Tobacco List.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Assembly - AB 3218 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3218 Wood et al. By Glazer (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3218 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3218 Wood et al. By Glazer (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3218 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 849, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 2.). |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2024-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 4.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22974.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22978.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22990 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104559.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104559.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30101.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |