CA AB322 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25711.9 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: Electric Program Investment Charge program: biomass.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 322 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB322 Salas et al. By Eggman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 322 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB322 Salas et al. By Eggman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 322 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2640.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2228.). |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1469.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25711.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |