CA AB3251 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5000, 5015.6, 5018, 5035.3, 5050, 5050.2, 5070.1, 5076, 5093, 5094, and 5096.21 of, and to add Sections 5062.3 and 5062.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Accountancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 3251 Business and Professions Assembly Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 3251 Business and Professions Assembly Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5015.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5035.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5050.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5062.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5062.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5070.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5076 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5094 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5096.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |