CA AB3260 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1367.01, 1368, 1368.01, and 1374.30 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10123.135 of, and to add Sections 10123.134 and 10123.136 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: reviews and grievances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3260 Pellerin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3260 Pellerin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 1.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1368.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.136 | New Code | See Bill Text |