CA AB3278 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14035, 29532.1, and 67930 of, and to amend the heading of Title 7.89 (commencing with Section 67930) of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 19.8 and 236.1 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 106062 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 34500, 34501.12, and 34505.5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 1803 of, and to add Sections 15303, 15303.3, and 15303.5 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-19 - Assembly - AB 3278 Transportation Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WILSON (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB3278 TRANS. (Wilson) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3278 Transportation Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB3278 TRANS. (Wilson) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3278 Transportation Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 29532.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 67930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 19.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 236.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 106062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 1803 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 34500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34501.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34505.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |