CA AB342 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65040.14 to Government Code, relating to the Office of Planning and Research.
Title
Office of Planning and Research.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Betsy Butler [D] | Asm. Paul Cook [R] | Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 342 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB342 Atkins By Kehoe (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 342 ATKINS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB342 Atkins By Kehoe (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 342 ATKINS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6360.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4689.). | |
2012-02-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-31 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-01 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Liu. | |
2011-08-31 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1356.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-07 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2011-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65040.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |