CA AB342 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.668 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.207 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: colorectal cancer: screening and testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 342 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB342 Gipson et al. By Pan (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 342 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB342 Gipson et al. By Pan (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 342 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2702.). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2115.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1627.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.668 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.207 | New Code | See Bill Text |