CA AB347 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12240 and 12246 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to weights and measures.
Title
Weights and measures: inspection: fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 347 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB347 Chau By Hill (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 347 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB347 Chau By Hill (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 347 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6826.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 5805.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1423.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 12240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 12246 | Amended Code | Citation Text |