CA AB355 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 30631 to the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: assault weapons: exception for peace officer training.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Alanis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 355 Alanis Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB355 Alanis By Alvarado-Gil (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 355 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB355 Alanis By Alvarado-Gil (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 355 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3072.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2391.). |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1950.) |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 7). |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 30631 | New Code | See Bill Text |