CA AB377 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 701, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 701, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 15.4.2 (commencing with Section 8349) of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to child care and development services.
Title
Child care subsidy plans: Counties of San Diego and Solano.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 377 Frazier Special Consent Calendar 1st Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB377 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 377 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB377 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 377 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 701, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3422.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2911.). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1816.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8349 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |