CA AB377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 113825, 114367.1, 114367.2, 114367.5, and 114367.6 of, and to repeal and add Sections 114367 and 114367.3 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to retail food facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Microenterprise home kitchen operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 377 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB377 Eduardo Garcia By Hurtado Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 377 Eduardo Garcia Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB377 Eduardo Garcia By Hurtado Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 377 Eduardo Garcia Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 3152.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2571.). |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1469.). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 113825 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114367 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114367.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114367.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114367.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114367.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114367.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |