CA AB380 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 3100) to Division 3 of the Labor Code, relating to energy.
Title
California Clean Energy Curriculum and Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and L. & E. | |
2009-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3100 | New Code | See Bill Text |