CA AB380 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2251 of the Family Code, relating to marriage.
Title
Marriage: putative spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - Assembly - AB 380 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 AB380 Waldron (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - AB 380 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 AB380 Waldron (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - AB 380 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2312.). |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1792.). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2015-05-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 885.) |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 2251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |