CA AB396 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3186 and 3252 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 10261 of, and to add Section 7201 to, the Public Contract Code, relating to works of improvement.
Title
Works of improvement: liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-18 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-06 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | |
2009-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 3252 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 7201 | New Code | See Bill Text |