CA AB396 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14053.8 and 14053.9 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: juvenile inmates.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] |
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 396 MITCHELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB396 Mitchell By Price (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 396 MITCHELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB396 Mitchell By Price (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 396 MITCHELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3073.). | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2357.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-01 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1568.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-16 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH by unanimous consent. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14053.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14053.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |