CA AB396 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12955 of, and to add Section 12955.05 to, the Government Code, relating to rental housing.
Title
Rental housing discrimination: applications: criminal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 29). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |