CA AB417 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21080.20.5 of, and to add and repeal Section 21080.20 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: California Environmental Quality
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 417 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Special Consent #10 AB417 Frazier By Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 417 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Special Consent #10 AB417 Frazier By Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 417 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 3297.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From Special Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2360.). |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 1112.) |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |