CA AB437 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12816.6 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: equity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 437 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 437 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 1799.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12816.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |