CA AB441 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 19961.05 of, and to add Section 19961.06 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to gaming.
Title
Local gaming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Assembly - AB 441 HALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB441 Hall By Florez (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 441 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB441 Hall By Florez (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 441 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-09 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 6790.) | |
2010-08-26 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 26). | |
2010-08-25 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.) | |
2010-08-24 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4797.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-03-17 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |
2009-06-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |
2009-05-11 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 2. Page 1357.) | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19961.05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19961.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |