CA AB443 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4764 and 4774 of, and to add Section 4767 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: delinquent parking and traffic violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB443 Lowenthal (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 443 LOWENTHAL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 443 LOWENTHAL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1607.). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1341.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12419.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4764 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4767 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 4774 | Amended Code | Citation Text |