CA AB447 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66031 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: students with disabilities: inclusive college programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Asm. Dawn Addis [D] |
Asm. Pilar Schiavo [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 447 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Special Consent AB447 Arambula et al. By Limón (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 447 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Special Consent AB447 Arambula et al. By Limón (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 447 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3442.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2686.). |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 12 corrected. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1810.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66031 | New Code | See Bill Text |