CA AB45 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-03 - Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-03 - Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 81010, 82007, 82013, 82015, 84101, 84211, 84215, 84605, and 85201 of, and to add Sections 84215.5, 86119, and 90009 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - AB 45 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 45 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading Amend By DICKINSON Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 45 DICKINSON Motion to Reconsider (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 45 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 45 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading Amend By DICKINSON Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 45 DICKINSON Motion to Reconsider (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 45 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 2109.) |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 11). |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1881.) Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1882.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 1882.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1844.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Dickinson. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8). |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2012-12-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 19. |
2012-12-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 81010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84215.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86119 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 89519 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 90003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 90005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 90009 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 91003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |