CA AB465 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11505.5 to the Education Code, relating to schools.
Title
Schools: parent involvement.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Joe Coto [D] | Asm. Felipe Fuentes [D] | Asm. Danny Gilmore [R] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Curren Price [D] | Asm. Tom Torlakson [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 465 COTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1549.) | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6). | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 11505.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |