CA AB465 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11105.3 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal history.
Title
Youth sports: criminal background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-08 - Assembly - AB 465 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB465 Bonilla By DeSaulnier (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 465 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB465 Bonilla By DeSaulnier (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 465 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2464.). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1696.). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1341.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11105.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 11105.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |