CA AB480 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 16724.3 to the Government Code, relating to state bonds.
Title
Bond acts: auditing.
Sponsors
Asm. Van Tran [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 480 TRAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 480 TRAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1952.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16724.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |