CA AB480 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1760 of the Insurance Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 43601 of, and to add Section 43601.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: solid waste facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 480 SOLORIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB480 Solorio By Calderon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 480 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB480 Solorio By Calderon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 480 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6362.). | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4744.). | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 14). | |
2012-04-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-07-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-23 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-06-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and E.Q. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1351.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1760 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1765.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 43601 | New Code | See Bill Text |