CA AB480 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9855 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to service contracts.
Title
Service contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 480 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB480 Ian Calderon By Padilla (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 480 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB480 Ian Calderon By Padilla (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 480 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2909.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2100.). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1670.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |