CA AB481 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 496, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 496, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 82036, 82036.5, 84102, 84104,84213, and 84506 of, and to amend, renumber, and add Section 82047.6 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 481 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB481 Gordon By Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 481 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB481 Gordon By Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 481 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 496, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 31). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 6753.). | |
2012-08-30 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6685.) | |
2012-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5006.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-02 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-06-28 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-06-27 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier. | |
2011-06-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 8). | |
2011-06-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 1336.) | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). | |
2011-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 101.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 336.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 357.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 82036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82036.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82047.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |