CA AB481 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4033, 5400, 5514, 5604.2, 5610, 5614.5, 5664, 5701.1, 5750, and 14682.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
California Mental Health Planning Council: name change.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14682.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5604.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5614.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5701.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB481 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB481 |