CA AB500 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44965, 45193, 87766, and 88193 of the Education Code, relating to employees.
Title
School and community college employees: paid maternity leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB500 Gonzalez By Leyva (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 500 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 500 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2507.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 1867.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |