CA AB51 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8222 to the Education Code, relating to early childcare and education.
Title
Early childcare and education: California state preschool program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Assembly - AB 51 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB51 Bonta et al. By Ashby (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 51 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB51 Bonta et al. By Ashby (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 51 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Ashby. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1704.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S. |
2022-12-09 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8222 | New Code | See Bill Text |